Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/09/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 11/17/2004