Refine your search

17 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/22/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-357.
10/22/2004 Signed by President.
10/21/2004 Presented to President.
10/11/2004 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 17. Record Vote Number: 211.
10/07/2004 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 141 (Roll no. 509).
10/07/2004 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 108-755 filed.(text of conference report: CR H8411-8640)
10/07/2004 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
10/06/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/05/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/04/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
09/29/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/15/2004 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.
07/15/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR 7/16/2004 S8281-8399)
06/17/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 251 - 178 (Roll no. 259).
06/16/2004 Committee on Agriculture discharged.
06/16/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 108-548, Part I.
06/04/2004 Introduced in House