Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/14/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/16/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/16/2004