Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/16/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/16/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/16/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/16/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/16/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/19/2004