Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/15/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/15/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/21/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/21/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/23/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/23/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/07/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/07/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/07/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/07/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/15/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/15/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/15/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/15/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/15/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/15/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/15/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/15/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/22/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/07/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/14/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/22/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/08/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/17/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/17/2004