Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/28/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/28/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/08/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/08/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/08/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004