Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/16/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/16/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/21/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/21/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/25/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/06/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/07/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/08/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/20/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/22/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/08/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/08/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/15/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/24/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/04/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/16/2004