Text: H.R.4596 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (10/01/2004)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 4596 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

                                                       Calendar No. 755
108th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 4596


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 29, 2004

                                Received

                           September 30, 2004

                          Read the first time

                            October 1, 2004

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
    To amend Public Law 97-435 to extend the authorization for the 
Secretary of the Interior to release certain conditions contained in a 
patent concerning certain land conveyed by the United States to Eastern 
             Washington University until December 31, 2009.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. EASTERN WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY LAND TRANSFER AUTHORIZATION 
              EXTENSION.

    The first section of Public Law 97-435 (96 Stat. 2281) is amended 
in subsection (c) by striking ``five years after the enactment of this 
Act'' and inserting ``on December 31, 2009''.

            Passed the House of Representatives September 28, 2004.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.




                                                       Calendar No. 755

108th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 4596

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

    To amend Public Law 97-435 to extend the authorization for the 
Secretary of the Interior to release certain conditions contained in a 
patent concerning certain land conveyed by the United States to Eastern 
             Washington University until December 31, 2009.

_______________________________________________________________________

                           September 30, 2004

                          Read the first time