Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/17/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/13/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/19/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004