There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To name the Department of Veterans Affairs outpatient clinic located in Peoria, Illinois, as the "Bob Michel Department of Veterans Affairs Outpatient Clinic".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/21/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 403).(text: CR 7/20/2004 H6074)
06/17/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/07/2004SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/22/2004SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/21/2004-12:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/21/2004-12:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 403). (text: CR 7/20/2004 H6074)
07/21/2004-12:39pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6460)
07/20/2004-5:28pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/20/2004-5:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4608.
07/20/2004-5:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6074-6076)
07/20/2004-5:16pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/17/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/17/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/17/2004 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/07/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4608. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs outpatient clinic located in Peoria, Illinois, as the Bob Michel Department of Veterans Affairs Outpatient Clinic.