Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/18/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/25/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/25/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/22/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/22/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/23/2004