Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/23/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/07/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/14/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/04/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/05/2004