Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/21/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/21/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/21/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/13/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 09/14/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/30/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/05/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/08/2004