Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/05/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/19/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/26/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/10/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/30/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/14/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 07/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/18/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/2004