Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/20/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/13/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/13/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/13/2004