Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/23/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/08/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/15/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/17/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/29/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/30/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 11/17/2004