Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/19/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/20/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/30/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/08/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/08/2004