Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/12/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/12/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/12/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/12/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/12/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/12/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/12/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/12/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/12/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/12/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/12/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/19/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/19/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/19/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/19/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/21/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/21/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/21/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/21/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/08/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/21/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/04/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/06/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/06/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/06/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/08/2004