Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/15/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/04/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/08/2004