Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/24/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/15/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/20/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/09/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/07/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/17/2004