Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/08/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/2004