Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/21/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/04/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/07/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/07/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/08/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/08/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/17/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/17/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/17/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/17/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/17/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/17/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/17/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/19/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/19/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/19/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/19/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/19/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/19/2004