Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/07/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/07/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/07/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/07/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/12/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/15/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/21/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/2004