Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/24/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/20/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/21/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/21/2004