Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 07/14/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/30/2004