Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/07/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 07/07/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/21/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/08/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/22/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/22/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/2004