There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the National Estuary Program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/30/2004Became Public Law No: 108-399. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2004Signed by President.
10/19/2004Presented to President.
10/11/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11326)
09/29/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7811)
09/13/2004Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-678.
06/25/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/30/2004Became Public Law No: 108-399. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2004Signed by President.
10/19/2004HousePresented to President.
10/12/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11326)
09/30/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/29/2004-6:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2004-6:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7811)
09/29/2004-6:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4731.
09/29/2004-6:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7811-7812)
09/29/2004-6:40pmHouseMr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/13/2004HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 417.
09/13/2004HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-678.
07/21/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/21/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/15/2004HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
07/15/2004HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
06/25/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/25/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/25/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/25/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/25/2004 Referred to
07/21/2004 Markup by
09/13/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-678
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/25/2004 Referred to
07/15/2004 Markup by
07/15/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4731. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-399 (10/30/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize appropriations for the National Estuary Program through FY 2010.