Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/09/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2004