Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/19/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/15/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/12/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/12/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/11/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/11/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/07/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/08/2004