There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Health Programs and Facilities Enhancement Act of 2004

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Health Programs and Facilities Enhancement Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Medical Facilities Management Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into certain major medical facility leases, to authorize that Secretary to transfer real property subject to certain limitations, otherwise to improve management of medical facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into certain major medical facility leases, to authorize that Secretary to transfer real property subject to certain limitations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7790-7792)
09/08/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-663.
07/07/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
09/30/2004SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/29/2004-5:31pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2004-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2004-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7790-7792)
09/29/2004-5:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4768.
09/29/2004-5:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7790-7796)
09/29/2004-5:03pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/08/2004HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403.
09/08/2004HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-663.
09/08/2004House-Provisions incorporated. See H. R. 4248, as amended, Sections 203, 303, 401, 403, 411, 412, 413, 415, 416, 417, and 603.
09/08/2004HouseReport amended to the House. H. Rept. 108-663.
07/21/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/21/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/08/2004HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/08/2004HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/08/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/08/2004HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1315-1316)
07/07/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/07/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/07/2004 Referred to
07/21/2004 Markup by
09/08/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-663
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/08/2004 Referred to
07/08/2004 Markup by
07/08/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4768. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/29/2004)

Veterans Health Programs and Facilities Enhancement Act of 2004 - Title I: Medical Facilities Management - (Sec. 101) Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts for major medical facility leases at specified locations. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2005 for the Medical Care account, to cover such leases.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into a lease for real property at the Fitzsimons Campus of the University of Colorado for a period of up to 75 years.

(Sec. 102) Authorizes the Secretary to transfer Department of Veterans Affairs real property to another department or agency of the United States, to a State, or to any public or private entity, including Indian tribes. Terminates such authority seven years after the enactment of this Act.

Establishes in the Treasury the Department of Veterans Affairs Capital Asset Fund, which may be used for costs associated with: (1) current or future real property transfers under this Act; (2) the improvement of patient care facilities for veterans; and (3) the transfer, lease, or adaptive use of properties listed on the National Register of Historic Places. Authorizes appropriations for the Fund.

Terminates the nursing home revolving fund. Transfers unobligated balances to the Capital Asset Fund.

(Sec. 103) Requires a report from the Secretary to the congressional veterans' committees, in each of 2005 through 2007, on historic properties administered or controlled by the Secretary.

(Sec. 104) Authorizes the use of certain Department funds for the construction or relocation of surface parking lots incidental to construction or maintenance projects.

(Sec. 105) Removes the congressional review requirement otherwise applicable to the obligation of funds for major medical facilities where funds have been authorized by law.

(Se. 106) Specifies that the construction, alteration, repair, remodeling, or improvement of property under an enhanced-use lease is not subject to State or local land use laws unless otherwise provided by the Secretary.

(Sec. 107) Amends the Veterans Millennium Health Care and Benefits Act to extend through 2005 the authority for long-term care pilot programs established under such Act.

Title II: Other Matters - (Sec. 201) Makes eligible for use of the Veterans' Canteen Service veterans enrolled in the Department's patient enrollment system.

(Sec. 202) Directs the Secretary, within 90 days after the enactment of this Act, to establish a peer review panel to assess the scientific and clinical merits of various proposed sites for designation as Department medical emergency preparedness centers. Requires the: (1) Secretary to solicit proposals for such designation within 60 days after enactment of this Act; and (2) peer review panel to complete proposal review within 60 days thereafter. Authorizes appropriations for such centers for FY 2005 through 2007. Requires the Under Secretary for Health to allocate certain other Department funds for such centers.