Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/08/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/30/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2004