Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/09/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/09/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/16/2004