There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Tijuana River Valley Estuary and Beach Sewage Cleanup Act of 2000 to extend the authorization of appropriations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/30/2004Became Public Law No: 108-425. (TXT | PDF)
11/30/2004Signed by President.
11/19/2004Presented to President.
11/16/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11390)
10/07/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8338)
09/15/2004Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-688, Part I.
07/09/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
11/30/2004Became Public Law No: 108-425. (TXT | PDF)
11/30/2004Signed by President.
11/19/2004HousePresented to President.
11/16/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11390)
10/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/07/2004-1:00amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/2004-1:00amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8338)
10/07/2004-12:54amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4794.
10/07/2004-12:54amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8338-8340)
10/07/2004-12:53amHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/01/2004HouseHouse Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 19, 2004.
09/15/2004HouseHouse Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 1, 2004.
09/15/2004HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-688, Part I.
07/21/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/21/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/15/2004HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
07/15/2004HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
07/12/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/09/2004HouseReferred to House International Relations
07/09/2004HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
07/09/2004HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/09/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/09/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/09/2004 Referred to
07/21/2004 Markup by
09/15/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-688
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/12/2004 Referred to
07/15/2004 Markup by
07/15/2004 Reported by
House International Relations07/09/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4794.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4794. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-425 (11/30/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 7, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Tijuana River Valley Estuary and Beach Sewage Cleanup Act of 2000 to request the U.S. section of the International Boundary and Water Commission, United States and Mexico, to give the highest priority to the implementation of Treaty Minute 311 to the Treaty for the Utilization of Waters of the Colorado and Tijuana Rivers and of the Rio Grande, which establishes a framework for the siting of a treatment facility in Mexico to provide for the secondary treatment of effluent from the South Bay International Wastewater Treatment Plant.

Modifies contractual provisions under the Act to: (1) repeal a requirement for annual payment to maintain the owner's 20 percent equity position throughout the term of the contract; and (2) authorize the payment of fees by the Commission to the owner of the Mexican facility to include costs associated with the purchase of any insurance or other financial instrument, which may be amortized over the term of the contract; and (3) provide that neither the Commission nor the U.S. Government shall be liable for payment of any cancellation fees if the Commission cancels the contract.

Authorizes the owner of the facility to purchase insurance or another financial instrument to cover the risk of cancellation of the contract by the Commission. Prohibits such insurance or other financial instrument from being provided or guaranteed by the U.S. Government. Allows the Government to reserve the right to validate independently the reasonableness of the premium when negotiating the annual service fee with the owner.

Extends authority for the sewage treatment program indefinitely and increases the amount authorized.