Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/20/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/20/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/07/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/07/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/07/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/08/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/08/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/08/2004