Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/13/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/13/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/08/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/14/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/17/2004