Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/21/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-478.
12/21/2004 Signed by President.
12/10/2004 Presented to President.
12/07/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11877)
10/06/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 10/7/2004 H8276)
07/14/2004 Introduced in House