Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 02/07/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/26/2003