Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/14/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/15/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/15/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/04/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/20/2004