Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/15/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/04/2004