Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/15/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/15/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/15/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/13/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/13/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/06/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/07/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2004