Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/19/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/19/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/19/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/20/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/21/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/17/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2004