Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 07/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/15/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/16/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/20/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/05/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/17/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/21/2003