Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/07/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/24/2004