Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/18/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/24/2004