Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/13/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/13/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/13/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/17/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/17/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/05/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/07/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/19/2004