Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/15/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/04/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/04/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/04/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/05/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/05/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/07/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/07/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/09/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/20/2004