Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/14/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/14/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/14/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/14/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 09/14/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/28/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/28/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/29/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/29/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/30/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/30/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/05/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/05/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/05/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/08/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/16/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/16/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/16/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/19/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/07/2004