There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Zuni Indian Tribe Water Rights Settlement Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the settlement of the water rights claims of the Zuni Indian Tribe in Apache County, Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/03/2003Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
04/03/2003Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
04/01/2003Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
02/12/2003Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
02/12/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/29/2003Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/20/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/29/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/12/2003 Referred to
04/01/2003 Hearings by
04/03/2003 Markup by
04/03/2003 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2003)

Zuni Indian Tribe Water Rights Settlement Act of 2003 - Ratifies the Settlement Agreement concerning Zuni Indian Tribe water rights claims in the Little Colorado River basin, Arizona.

Includes the provision of assistance for acquiring surface water rights and wetland restoration. Names the Tribe, the State of Arizona and specified state agencies, specified neighboring non-Indian communities, and specified water and power companies as parties to the agreement.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to execute the Settlement Agreement and subsequent, mutually agreed upon amendments.

Establishes and authorizes appropriations to the Zuni Indian Tribe Water Rights Development Fund to be allocated among specified activities, including the acquisition of water rights and restoration at the Zuni Heaven Reservation. Includes funds paid to the Tribe as required by the Settlement Agreement. Conditions Zuni expenditures from such Fund upon the approval of a tribal management plan and an expenditure plan.

Directs the Secretary to take title to specified lands in trust for the benefit of the Tribe, including lands to become part of the Reservation. Sets forth the status of such lands with regard to Federal and State water rights and ad valorem taxes.

Extinguishes all claims for water rights in Zuni lands.