Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/08/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/13/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/17/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/17/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2004