There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 McHenry Street in Rosine, Kentucky, as the "Bill Monroe Post Office".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-473. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2004Signed by President.
12/10/2004Presented to President.
12/07/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11877)
10/06/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 10/7/2004 H8272)
07/22/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-473. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2004Signed by President.
12/10/2004HousePresented to President.
12/07/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/07/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11877)
10/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/06/2004-5:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/2004-5:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 10/7/2004 H8272)
10/06/2004-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4968.
10/06/2004-5:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 10/7/2004 H8272)
10/06/2004-5:32pmHouseMr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/22/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
07/22/2004HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1507)
07/22/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform07/22/2004 Referred to
09/15/2004 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4968.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4968. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-473 (12/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the House on July 22, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 McHenry Street in Rosine, Kentucky, as the "Bill Monroe Post Office."